Ponesse, David John Anthony (CPSO#: 19494)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Mar 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Mar 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1309 Yonge Street
Box 968
Walkerton ON  N0G 2V0
Phone: (519) 881-1200
Fax: (519) 881-1201
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Ponesse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ponesse ( CPSO# 19494 )

Business Address:
1309 Yonge Street
Walkerton ON  N0G 2V0
Phone Number: (519) 881-1200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN ANTHONY PONESSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PONESSE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jan 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1983