Ponesse, Jonathan Stephen (CPSO#: 73951)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite WW2204
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L2
Phone: 613-737-0871 Ext. 4327
Fax: 613-523-5167
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Ponesse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ponesse ( CPSO# 73951 )

Business Address:
Suite WW2204
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L2
Phone Number: (613) 737-0871

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN STEPHEN PONESSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PONESSE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2007