Ponich, Terry Peter (CPSO#: 61738)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Room E6 323A
800 Commissiioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 667-6878
Fax: (519) 667-6820
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ponich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ponich ( CPSO# 61738 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
Room E6-323A
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6878

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERRY PETER PONICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PONICH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1989