Ponnampalam, Mathew Chelvasingam (CPSO#: 23890)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Scottish Conjoint Board(Scottish triple), 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2006

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Sep 1993
Summary:

 In a decision released in September 1993, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Ponnampalam guilty of 
 professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that 
 he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all 
 the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional.  Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty:

1.	Dr. Ponnampalam 
 was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.

2.	Dr. 
 Ponnampalam was to be fined the sum of $5000.00.

3.	Failure to comply with items 1 and 2 of the 
 penalty within sixty days of this Order becoming final would result in the suspension of Dr. 
 Ponnampalam(s licence to practice for a period of three months.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 05 Apr 1994
Hearing Date(s): 03 May 1993