Ponoran, Tudor Arbore (CPSO#: 99054)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Jun 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cluj, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tudor Ponoran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Ponoran ( CPSO# 99054 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Jul 2012 to 03 Oct 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 07 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 21 Dec 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2016 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Tudor Arbore Ponoran may practise medicine independently in internal
                  medicine.