Ponti-Sgargi, Michelle Grace (CPSO#: 68947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 Sanatorium Rd.
London ON  N6H 3W7
Phone: (519) 858-2774 Ext. 2085
Fax: (519) 858-9789
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shoemaker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Shoemaker ( CPSO# 68938 )
Dr. M. Ponti-Sgargi ( CPSO# 68947 )

Business Address:
1199 Queen Street
Kincardine ON  N2Z 1G6
Phone Number: (519) 396-3331

Business Address:
600 Sanatorium Road
London ON  N6H 3W7
Phone Number: (519) 858-2774

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
Room C6-128
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3485

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE GRACE PONTI-SGARGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PONTI-SGARGI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1999