Poolacherla, Yuva Raju (CPSO#: 102562)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jan 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Jan 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Tamil, Telugu

Education:University of Madras, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia &
Peioperative Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine
C3-172 339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: 5196858500 Ext. 55115
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: (226) 377-5877
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yuva Raju Poolacherla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Poolacherla ( CPSO# 102562)

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (226) 377-5877

Business Address:
Department of Anesthesia & Peioperative Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine
Room C3-172
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 22 Jan 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Yuva Raju Poolacherla may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Anesthesia & Perioperative Medicine, University of Western Ontario,
                        in which Dr. Poolacherla holds an academic appointment at the rank
                        of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in the Department of Anesthesia and Pain Medicine at the Hospital
                        for Sick Children, and
                  
                  (iii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Poolacherla  no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Poolacherla's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Poolacherla's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on January 22, 2014, and expires on June 30,
                  2018.  Upon renewal of Dr. Poolacherla's academic appointment at the
                  University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject
                  to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.