Poolman, Rudolf Wilhelm (CPSO#: 83984)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Amsterdam, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 02 Jan 2006 to 27 Mar 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 28 Mar 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006