Poon, Annette Olive (CPSO#: 24928)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 15 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009