Poon, Jimmy Chi Ming (CPSO#: 30896)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 24 Apr 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 30
1675 The Chase
Mississauga ON  L5M 5Y7
Phone: (905) 820-1398
Fax: (905) 607-6048
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 26 & 27
505 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3T 7T1
Canada
Phone: (905) 597-3282
Fax: (905) 597-3299
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2008
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 29 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 24 May 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 24 May 2016 Active View Details [+]
            The following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate
            of registration held by Dr. Jimmy Chi Ming Poon, by Order by the Discipline
            Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario on September 29,
            2008, and by subsequent Order of the Discipline Committee on May 24, 2016, to
            vary the terms, conditions and limitations: 

            (a)   Dr. Poon shall be prohibited from performing all surgical procedures and
                  be limited to surgical assists only, as defined in paragraph 2(b). For
                  greater certainty, "all surgical procedures" includes but is not limited
                  to, all cosmetic surgical procedures and all minor office surgical
                  procedures except the following, which Dr. Poon is permitted to perform:

                  i.    minor diagnostic procedures  on superficial lesions that are not
                        performed  on the  face or neck, that are less than 2 cm, that are
                        performed under local anesthetic for medical, not cosmetic reasons
                        and that are billable to   OHIP;
                  
                  ii.   incisions and drainage of superficial abscesses that are not
                        performed  on the face   or neck and that are billable to  OHIP;
                  
                  iii.  suturing of uncomplicated  superficial lacerations that are not
                        performed  on the face  or neck and that are billable to OHIP;  and
                  
                  iv.   minor, minimally  invasive cosmetic procedures  such as dermal
                        filler  injections, chemical peels, ultrasound  and laser
                        therapies, hair removal and the   like.
                  
            (b)   Dr. Poon may practise as a surgical assistant only in a hospital  based
                  setting and when  a Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
                  certified surgeon, who is approved by and a member of the College of
                  Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario and who is aware of the terms,
                  conditions and limitations on Dr. Poon's certificate of registration, is
                  performing the surgery and is in attendance throughout;

            (c)   Dr. Poon shall    submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced
                                    inspections of his
                  practices and patients' charts by College representatives for the
                  purposes of his compliance with these terms, conditions and limitations
                  on his certificate of registration.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Sep 2008
Summary:

On September 29, 2008 the Discipline Committee found Dr. Poon to have committed an 
act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession.  The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    The Registrar impose immediately the following terms, conditions and limitations 
      on Dr. Poon’s Certificate of Registration: 
      (a) Dr. Poon shall be prohibited from performing all surgical procedures and be 
          limited  to  surgical  assists  only,  as  defined  in  paragraph  2(b).  For  greater 
          certainty,  “all  surgical  procedures”  includes,  but  is  not  limited  to,  all 
          cosmetic surgical procedures and all minor office surgical procedures except 
          for those procedures set out in paragraph 2(d);  
                 
      (b) Dr. Poon may practice as a surgical assistant only in a hospital based setting 
          and when  a Royal  College of Physicians  & Surgeons of Canada  certified 
          surgeon, who is approved by and a member of the College of Physicians and 
          Surgeons  of  Ontario  and  who  is  aware  of  the  terms,  conditions  and 
          limitations on Dr. Poon’s certificate of registration is performing the surgery 
          and is in attendance throughout; 
       
      (c) At  his  own  expense,  Dr.  Poon  shall  undergo  the  Physician  Review  and 
          Enhancement  Program (“PREP™”)  pertaining  to  his  family  practice  and 
          shall abide by any and  all reasonable recommendations made as result of  
          PREP™.  Dr. Poon shall participate in the PREP™  course within 6 weeks 
          of the date of this Order; 
       
      (d) If Dr. Poon receives from PREP™ a Category 3 result or better, as a part of 
          his  family  practice  he  shall be  permitted  to  perform  the  following  minor 
          office procedures so long as they are not performed on the face or neck and 
          provided the procedures are billable to OHIP: 
 
          i.   minor  diagnostic  procedures  on  superficial  lesions  less  than  2  cm, 
               under local anesthetic, for medical, not cosmetic reasons; 
          ii.  incisions and drainage of superficial abscesses; and  
         iii.  suturing of uncomplicated superficial lacerations; and 
       
      (e) Dr. Poon shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of 
          his practices and patients’ charts by College representatives for the purposes 
          of  his  compliance  with  these  terms,  conditions  and  limitations  on  his 
          certificate of registration.  
          
2.    The results of this proceeding be included in the register.   
 
On May 24, 2016, further to a motion by Dr. Jimmy Chi Ming Poon, the Discipline 
Committee ordered the September 29, 2008 Order regarding Dr. Poon to be varied. The 
Committee ordered and directed: 
 
   2.    the Registrar to impose immediately the following terms, conditions and 
         limitations on Dr. Poon's Certificate of Registration: 
         a. Dr. Poon shall be prohibited from performing all surgical procedures and 
            be limited to surgical assists only, as defined in paragraph 2(b). For greater 
            certainty, "all surgical procedures" includes but is not limited to, all 
            cosmetic surgical procedures and all minor office surgical procedures 
            except the following, which Dr. Poon is permitted to perform: 
               i. minor diagnostic procedures on superficial lesions that are not 
                  performed on the face or neck, that are less than 2 cm, that are 
                  performed under local anesthetic for medical, not cosmetic reasons 
                  and that are billable to OHIP; 
              ii. incisions and drainage of superficial abscesses that are not 
                  performed on the face or neck and that are billable to OHIP;  
              iii. suturing of uncomplicated superficial lacerations that are not 
                  performed on the face or neck and that are billable to OHIP; and  
              iv. minor, minimally invasive cosmetic procedures such as dermal 
                  filler injections, chemical peels, ultrasound and laser therapies, hair 
                  removal and the like. 
         b. Dr. Poon may practise as a surgical assistant only in a hospital based 
            setting and when a Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada 
            certified surgeon, who is approved by and a member of the College of 
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario and who is aware of the terms, 
            conditions and limitations on Dr. Poon's certificate of registration, is 
            performing the surgery and is in attendance throughout; 
         c. Dr. Poon shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections 
            of his practices and patients' charts by College representatives for the 
            purposes of his compliance with these terms, conditions and limitations on 
            his certificate of registration; and 
   3.    the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 29, 2008