Poon, Stephanie Chi-Wing (CPSO#: 84420)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Cardiology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 2254
Fax: (416) 480-5039
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE CHI-WING POON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2014