Pop, Anca (CPSO#: 80869)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
307 Commissioners Rd. W
Suite #2
London ON  N6J 1Y4
Phone: (519) 432-0400
Fax: (519) 432-0401
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anca Pop Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pop ( CPSO# 80869 )

Business Address:
307 Commissioners Road West
Unit 2
London ON  N6J 1Y4
Phone Number: (519) 432-0400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANCA POP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2004