Popadiuk, Catherine Mary (CPSO#: 67718)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 May 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 May 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 Prince Philip Drive
St John's NL  A1B 3V6
Phone: (709) 777-6564
Fax: (709) 777-8533

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARY POPADIUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPADIUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1994