Popat, Saurin Rajnikant (CPSO#: 64996)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CHANCe at Delaware Medical Group
1083 Delaware Avenue
Buffalo NY  14209
United States
Phone: (716) 882-1023
Fax: (716) 882-1022
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Head & Neck Surgery
Erie County Medical Center
462 Grider Street
Buffalo NY  14215
United States
Phone: (716) 898-3698
Fax: (716) 898-5587
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAURIN RAJNIKANT POPAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPAT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993