Pope, Elena (CPSO#: 67701)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6883
Fax: (416) 813-7909
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc Pope Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Pope ( CPSO# 67701 )
Dr. M. Pope ( CPSO# 60898 )

Business Address:
Suite 500
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 848-7777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 02 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELENA POPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 06 May 1995
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1999