Pope, Janet Elizabeth (CPSO#: 55526)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Dec 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Care London
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6332
Fax: (519) 646-6334
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Janet E. Pope Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pope ( CPSO# 55526 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care London
D2 - 268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6332

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 02 Dec 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET ELIZABETH POPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Oct 1992
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1990