Pope, Meredith Leigh (CPSO#: 100292)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
23B - 421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone: (519) 578-3510
Fax: (519) 578-6040
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Pope Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pope ( CPSO# 100292)

Business Address:
23B - 421 Greenbrooke Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone Number: (519) 578-3510

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEREDITH LEIGH POPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015