Pope, William Duncan Bernard (CPSO#: 43089)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Dec 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 406
141 Wellington Crescent
Winnipeg MB  R3M 3X3
Phone: (204) 488-0060
Fax: (204) 488-0130

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 10 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM DUNCAN BERNARD POPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1991