Popovic, Jelena (CPSO#: 76741)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital, SCN
Toronto East Health Network
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 6568
Fax: (416) 469-6020
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jelena Popovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Popovic ( CPSO# 76741 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JELENA POPOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2002