Popuri, Preeti (CPSO#: 86883)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Telugu

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 MAIN STREET WEST
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone: 905 546 9885
Fax: (905) 972 8903
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PREETI POPURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPURI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008