Popuri, Ramu (CPSO#: 85598)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Telugu

Education:University of Liverpool, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ramu Popuri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Popuri ( CPSO# 85598 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMU POPURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPURI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2008