Porat, Shay (CPSO#: 91755)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The Hebrew University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012