Porayko, Lorne David (CPSO#: 71252)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2000