Pordeli, Peyvand (CPSO#: 79696)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Persian

Education:Ghazvin University of Medical Sciences, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2007 to 31 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017