Porhownik, Nancy Rose (CPSO#: 90159)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RS315- 810 Sherbrook Street, Winnipeg, MB R3A 1R9
Date Received: 13 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 07 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jan 2009 to 11 Feb 2009
Elective Trainee - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015