Porta Sanchez, Andreu (CPSO#: 104714)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Barcelona, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 23 Oct 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jan 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Oct 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Oct 2017