Porte, Mark Christopher (CPSO#: 86649)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite LL2
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: 705 739 1233
Fax: 705 739 1003
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Porte Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Porte ( CPSO# 86649 )

Business Address:
LL2 - 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 739-1233

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK CHRISTOPHER PORTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PORTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012