Porter, Daniela (CPSO#: 88560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: Lanc, Daniela (used until: 25 May 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lifemark Sport Medicine
Repsol Sport Centre
2225 Macleod Trail S
Calgary AB  T2G 5B6
Phone: 403-237-5633
Fax: 403-237-5142

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELA PORTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PORTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 08 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Feb 2010 to 08 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 09 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2015