Porter, Ewan Alistair (CPSO#: 27604)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2012