Porter, Jean Evelyn (CPSO#: 21687)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Oct 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 1968

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 77024
301 Metcalfe Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1R9
Phone: (343) 988-4428
Fax: (613) 569-7170
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jean E. Porter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 14 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 416-258-5734 or 1-800-775-0093 Fax: 1-888-316-4125 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 30 Jun 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN EVELYN PORTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PORTER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1968