Porter, John Seymour (CPSO#: 26207)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John S. Porter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 18 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016