Porter, Phillip James (CPSO#: 64005)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wisconsin Brain and Spine Centre
Suite A
1200 Oakleaf Way
Altoona WI  54720
United States
Phone: (715) 832-1700
Fax: (715) 832-2762

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Wisconsin

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 10 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILLIP JAMES PORTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PORTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1992