Porter, Sara Lara (CPSO#: 86755)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
Heritage wing
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 546-1101
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Porter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Porter ( CPSO# 86755 )

Business Address:
Providence Care Hospital
Heritage Wing
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARA LARA PORTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PORTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 19 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 20 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 16 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2012