Porter, William Ronald (CPSO#: 26852)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of St. Andrews, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. Ronald Porter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 15 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr Dominic Li Suite 1116 123 Edwards St Toronto ON M5G 1E2
Date Received: 04 May 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018