Portnoi, Galina Grigorievna (CPSO#: 81886)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Doneck Medical University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
7131 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Z1
Phone: (905) 764-7474
Fax: (905) 695-0238
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Oct 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GALINA GRIGORIEVNA PORTNOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PORTNOI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Sep 2004 to 17 Oct 2004
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2004

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 14, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)