Portugal, Francisco Suyat (CPSO#: 30962)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Feb 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:Far Eastern University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
33 Howard Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1J6
Phone: (416) 928-1197
Fax: (416) 925-6093
Electoral District: 10

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 18 Feb 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 18 Feb 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  February  18, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate  of  registration  held  by  Dr.  Francisco Suyat
            Portugal, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by  Dr.  Portugal
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. FRANCISCO SUYAT PORTUGAL
                                          ("Dr. Portugal")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule  2
                  to  the  Regulated  Health  Professions  Act,  1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Portugal, certificate of registration number 30962, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information  regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I,   Dr.  Portugal,  acknowledge  that  the  College  has  conducted   an
                  investigation  into  my  practice, and found deficiencies in my infection
                  prevention and control. While  I  have  remedied  these deficiencies, the
                  College wishes to ensure that I continue to employ  acceptable  infection
                  prevention  and  control  practices.  I am aware of the College's concern
                  about protecting the public. 

            (4)   I, Dr. Portugal, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force for
                  a minimum period of two years from the  commencement  date, identified in
                  paragraph (6) below. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I,  Dr.  Portugal,  acknowledge  and  agree  that  I  am  bound  by  this
                  Undertaking from March 9, 2016.

            (6)   I,  Dr.  Portugal,  undertake  to  inform  the College of each and  every
                  location that I practise or have privileges,  including,  but not limited
                  to,   hospital(s),   clinic(s)   and   office(s),   in  any  jurisdiction
                  (collectively  my "Practice Location(s)"), within fifteen  (15)  days  of
                  executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform
                  the College of any  and  all  new  Practice Locations within fifteen (15)
                  days of commencing practice at that location.

            (7)   I, Dr. Portugal, undertake and agree  that  I  will  submit  to,  and not
                  interfere  with,  unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)  and
                  and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor
                  my compliance with acceptable infection control and prevention practices.
                  I understand that these  inspections  will  occur  every six months for a
                  period of two years, and the results of the inspections  will be reported
                  to the College. After two years, if, in the College's sole discretion, it
                  deems the inspection reports satisfactory, the inspections will cease. If
                  the  reports  are  not  satisfactory,  the inspections will continue.  In
                  addition, the College may make such other  use  of the inspection reports
                  as it deems appropriate (for example, without limiting the foregoing, the
                  reports could ground a new investigation or a referral  of allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee). 

            (8)   I,   Dr.  Portugal,  undertake  to  comply  with  this  Undertaking   and
                  acknowledge  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may
                  constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may
                  result  in  a  referral   of  specified  allegations  to  the  Discipline
                  Committee.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Portugal, acknowledge  that  I  shall  be  solely  responsible for
                  payment  of  all  fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising  from  the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Portugal, acknowledge  and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of Undertaking and  that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this  Undertaking,  or  have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (11)  I,  Dr.  Portugal,  acknowledge  that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations  on my certificate of registration for
                  the  purposes  of  section  23  of  the  Code.  I  understand  that  this
                  Undertaking  shall  be  information  on the College's  Register  that  is
                  available  to  the public during the time  period  that  the  Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (12)  I, Dr. Portugal,  acknowledge  that  the following summary will appear on
                  the College's Register that is available  to  the  public during the time
                  period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        An investigation into Dr. Portugal's practice revealed deficiencies
                        in  his  infection  prevention  and  control practices.  While  Dr.
                        Portugal has remedied these deficiencies,  the  College  wishes  to
                        ensure  that he continues to employ acceptable infection prevention
                        and control  practices.  Therefore,  the College will be conducting
                        unannounced    inspections    into   Dr.   Portugal's    practices,
                        approximately every six months for at least two years. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Portugal, give my irrevocable  consent  to  the  College  to  make
                  appropriate  enquiries  of OHIP, and/or any person or institution who may
                  have relevant information,  in  order  for  the  College  to  monitor  my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (14)  I,  Dr. Portugal, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "A". 

            (15)  I, Dr.  Portugal,  give  my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to all relevant parties:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising  from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from  the  monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Portugal, give my irrevocable consent  to  the  College to provide
                  this  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague  with  similar
                  responsibilities,  at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s)  of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances  of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information  arising from the  monitoring  of  my  compliance  with  this
                  Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Portugal,  give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors
                  and Chiefs of Staff  to  disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking; and/or
                  
                  (b)   relevant for the purposes  of  monitoring  my  compliance with this
                        Undertaking.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Aug 2010
Summary:

On August 10, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Portugal has committed an act of 
professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the 
Medicine Act, 1991, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded 
by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
Between June 2007 and June 2009, a patient, through her authorized representative, sent 
approximately thirteen requests to Dr. Portugal requesting copies of all of his clinical notes and 
records from 2002 to present.   Despite receiving these requests, Dr. Portugal failed to provide 
Patient A's clinical notes and records to the patient or her authorized representative. 
Dr. Portugal stated that the delay in response to the patient s request was as a result of failures by 
his office to either respond to the requests or bring them to his attention and he has instituted 
changes in order to avoid similar problems in the future. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Portugal's certificate of registration for a period of one month, 
      which suspension shall itself be suspended if, within two months of the date of this 
      Order: 
 
      i.    Dr. Portugal retains the services of a third party organization/efficiency expert (the 
            "TPO") to evaluate his current administrative practices; 
      ii.   Dr. Portugal implements all reasonable recommendations made by the TPO 
            regarding the management and day to day administration of his practice; and 
      iii.  Dr. Portugal provides a letter from the TPO confirming that all reasonable 
            recommendations have been implemented.  
 
2.    The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Portugal's 
      certificate of registration: 
 
      (a)   Dr. Portugal shall provide a report from the TPO twelve months after he 
            implements all of their recommendations, confirming that his organization system 
            remains working and that his practice is running efficiently; and 
 
      (b)   Dr. Portugal shall successfully complete, at his own expense, the College's 
            Medical Ethics and Informed Consent Course within twelve months of the date of 
            this Order. 
 
3.    The terms, conditions and limitations in paragraph 2 herein shall be removed by the 
      College after it receives confirmation that those terms, conditions and limitations have 
      been fulfilled. 
 
4.    Dr. Portugal appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 
5.    Dr. Portugal pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650 within 30 days of the date 
      of this Order.  
 
6.    The results of this proceeding be included in the register. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): August 10, 2010

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 18, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Francisco Suyat Portugal to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 18, 2016:

An investigation into Dr. Portugal’s practice revealed deficiencies in his infection prevention and control practices. While Dr. Portugal has remedied these deficiencies, the College wishes to ensure that he continues to employ acceptable infection prevention and control practices. Therefore, the College will be conducting unannounced inspections into Dr. Portugal’s practices, approximately every six months for at least two years.