Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Posel, Clifford Howard (CPSO#: 66883)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 7173
Fax: (416) 480-6878
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clifford Posel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Posel ( CPSO# 66883 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room FG14
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLIFFORD HOWARD POSEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POSEL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998