Posner, Matthew (CPSO#: 61871)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona
USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Dec 2015