Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Posner, Paul Lindsay (CPSO#: 56858)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 212
2221 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5
Phone: (416) 247-6175
Fax: (416) 247-9936
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: 416-242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Posner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Posner ( CPSO# 56858 )

Business Address:
Suite 212
2221 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5
Phone Number: (416) 247-6175

Business Address:
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL LINDSAY POSNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POSNER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1987