Poss, Christopher James (CPSO#: 101224)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Emergency Medicine
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Poss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dempster ( CPSO# 100660)
Dr. C. Poss ( CPSO# 101224)

Business Address:
Division of Emergency Medicine
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 23 Nov 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JAMES POSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POSS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015