Post, William Douglas (CPSO#: 28825)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jul 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009