Postl, Lara Anne (CPSO#: 92392)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CHEO
200-311 McArthur Ave.
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M3
Phone: 613-738-6990 Ext. 232
Fax: 613-738-4891
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LARA ANNE POSTL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POSTL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2012