Postuk, Peter Caldwell (CPSO#: 65133)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 29 Nov 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Nov 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1994
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 29 Nov 1996