Potashner, Wayne Jeffrey (CPSO#: 55709)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
4430 Bathurst Street
Downsview ON  M3H 3S3
Phone: (416) 631-6090
Fax: (416) 631-6535
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wayne Potashner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Potashner ( CPSO# 55709 )

Business Address:
4430 Bathurst Street
Suite 209
Toronto ON  M3H 3S3
Phone Number: (416) 631-6090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 04 Dec 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAYNE JEFFREY POTASHNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTASHNER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1986