Potoczny, Stefan (CPSO#: 96551)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London X Ray Associates
Unit 104
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone: (519) 672-5270 Ext. 7051
Fax: (519) 672-4459
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stefan Potoczny Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Potoczny ( CPSO# 96551 )

Business Address:
London X Ray Associates
Unit 104
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 672-7900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Huron Hospital Exeter
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEFAN POTOCZNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTOCZNY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Apr 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2011