Potter, Eleanor Rose Ann (CPSO#: 70003)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200B
1105 E Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone: (905) 420-9999
Fax: (905) 420-6458
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Potter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Potter ( CPSO# 70003 )

Business Address:
Suite 200B
1105 East Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone Number: (905) 420-9999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELEANOR ROSE ANN POTTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997