Potter, Geraldine Dawn (CPSO#: 58627)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Extendicare
90 Chedmac Drive
Hamilton ON  L9C 7R0
Phone: (905) 318-4472
Fax: (905) 318-1162
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dundurn Place Care Centre
39 Mary Street
Hamilton ON  L8R 3L8
Canada
Phone: (905) 523-6427
Fax: (905) 528-0610
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERALDINE DAWN POTTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTTER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2005