Potter, Jennifer Ann (CPSO#: 75482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East End Community Health Centre
1619 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M4L 1G4
Phone: (416) 778-5858
Fax: (416) 778-5855
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANN POTTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Jun 2000 to 24 Jul 2000
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Mar 2001 to 30 Mar 2001
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2001