Potter, Murray Alexander (CPSO#: 69147)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Room 3N17
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4J9
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73718
Fax: (905) 521-2651
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Biochemistry Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MURRAY ALEXANDER POTTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Medical Biochemistry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Medical Biochemistry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2002