Pottie, Kevin Christopher (CPSO#: 65058)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Dalhousie University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Medicine Centre
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 241-3344
Fax: (613) 241-1971
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin Pottie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Pottie ( CPSO# 65058 )

Business Address:
Family Medicine Centre
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 241-3344

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN CHRISTOPHER POTTIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTTIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1993